Jawabanmu

2014-08-22T16:41:06+07:00
5 x 5 = 25 x 25 = 625 x 100 = 62500 : 1000 = 62,5
2014-08-22T16:42:24+07:00
(5X5X25X100)=25X25X100=625X100
=62.500
62.500/1000=625/10=62,5