Jawabanmu

2014-08-19T11:49:02+07:00
E. 36×14+36×24+36×62
=(36×14)+(36×24)+(36×62)
=504 + 664 + 2232
=1168 + 2232
=3400
2014-08-19T14:37:09+07:00
(29x21) - (29 x 11) = 290
  609    -     319  =290
SELESAI