Jawabanmu

2013-12-09T07:15:27+07:00
16 - 12 + 56 x 567 =34.020 : 2 =17.010
2013-12-09T09:18:48+07:00
16-12+56x567=
16-(12+(56x567)=
16-(12+3175)=
16-31764:2=
-31748:2=-15874
16-12+56x567=.....:2=
16-12+(56x567)=.....:2=
(16-12)+(31752)=...:2=
4+31752
31756 :2 = 15878