600 : 5 + 15 X 17 = (600 : 5) + (15 x 17 ) = 120 + 255 = 275
(600:5) + (15+17) = 120+255=375
600 : 5 + 15 X 17 = (600 : 5) + (15 x 17 ) = 120 + 255 = 375
Komentar sudah dihapus
600:5+15*17=375

Jawabanmu

2014-05-20T06:24:30+07:00
2014-05-20T06:25:37+07:00