Jawabanmu

2014-04-29T20:46:20+07:00
V = p x l x t
5400 = 25 x 18 x t
5400 = 450 x t
t = 5400/450 = 12

lp = 2(px l) + 2(p x t) + 2 (l x t)
lp = 2(25 x18) + 2(25 x 12) + 2(18 x 15)
lp = 900 + 600 + 540
lp = 2040 cm
1 3 1
2014-04-29T21:57:40+07:00
T= V : (p x l)
t = 5400 cm kubik : (25 x 18)
t = 5400 : 450
t = 12 cm

Lp = 2 (pl + pt + lt)
Lp = 2 (450 + 300 + 216)
Lp = 2 x 966
Lp = 1932

Maaf kalo ada salah hitung :v